Guto Ferreira - Manager profile
History
This is an overview of the career of a manager.
wappen | Club & role | Appointed | In charge until | Matches | PPM | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ceará SC Manager | 19/20 (Mar 18, 2020) | 21/22 (Aug 29, 2021) | 101 | 1.58 | ||
Ponte Preta Manager | 14/15 (Jul 24, 2014) | 15/16 (Aug 3, 2015) | 66 | 1.64 | ||
EC Bahia Manager | 21/22 (Oct 8, 2021) | 21/22 (Jun 26, 2022) | 49 | 1.51 | ||
Sport Recife Manager | 18/19 (Feb 20, 2019) | 19/20 (Feb 13, 2020) | 47 | 1.70 | ||
Ponte Preta Manager | 12/13 (Sep 22, 2012) | 12/13 (Jun 6, 2013) | 42 | 1.64 | ||
Internacional Manager | 16/17 (May 30, 2017) | 17/18 (Nov 11, 2017) | 34 | 1.85 | ||
Chapecoense Manager | 15/16 (Sep 14, 2015) | 15/16 (Jun 27, 2016) | 32 | 1.50 | ||
Portuguesa Manager | 13/14 (Jul 28, 2013) | 13/14 (Feb 2, 2014) | 31 | 1.35 | ||
EC Bahia Manager | 15/16 (Jun 27, 2016) | 16/17 (May 30, 2017) | 30 | 1.73 | ||
Goiás Manager | 22/23 (Dec 10, 2022) | 22/23 (Apr 10, 2023) | 25 | 2.12 | ||
Coritiba FC Manager | 23/24 (Nov 27, 2023) | 23/24 (May 4, 2024) | 22 | 1.50 | ||
Coritiba FC Manager | 22/23 (Aug 19, 2022) | 22/23 (Dec 9, 2022) | 16 | 1.25 | ||
Chapecoense Manager | 18/19 (Aug 7, 2018) | 18/19 (Oct 15, 2018) | 13 | 1.00 | ||
EC Bahia Manager | 17/18 (Dec 26, 2017) | 17/18 (Jun 3, 2018) | 12 | 1.17 | ||
Ceará SC Manager | 22/23 (Jun 30, 2023) | 23/24 (Aug 28, 2023) | 11 | 1.27 | ||
Figueirense FC Manager | 13/14 (May 1, 2014) | 14/15 (Jul 23, 2014) | 11 | 0.73 | ||
Criciúma EC Manager | 10/11 (Jun 14, 2011) | 11/12 (Aug 3, 2011) | 11 | 1.64 | ||
ABC FC Manager | 11/12 (Aug 16, 2011) | 11/12 (Aug 30, 2011) | 4 | 0.50 | ||
Naval 1º de Maio Manager | 04/05 (Jul 1, 2004) | 04/05 (Sep 13, 2004) | 2 | 1.50 | ||
Mogi Mirim Manager | 11/12 (Feb 11, 2012) | 12/13 (Sep 21, 2012) | - | 0.00 | ||
Mogi Mirim Manager | 10/11 (Jan 3, 2011) | 10/11 (Jun 13, 2011) | - | 0.00 | ||
Naval 1º de Maio Manager | 03/04 (Mar 1, 2004) | 03/04 (Apr 26, 2004) | - | 0.00 | ||
Penafiel Manager | 03/04 (Jul 1, 2003) | 03/04 (Feb 4, 2004) | - | 0.00 | ||
Inter U20 Manager | 96/97 | 99/00 | - | 0.00 |
ncG1vNJzZmivp6x7tb7Ap6qfnaKirrO302eaqKVfnMK1u4yfnKuqlZ6%2FonvPq6afoZxkwbOtyKecq2dhboJ5gI6spqusX5a7u63HpWWdnaOY
Patria Henriques
Update: 2024-05-23